House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2551 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 689 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Filed |