Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HCR51 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Hemphill, et al. H.C.R. No. 51
 (Senate Sponsor - Seliger)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The names of certain individuals stand out boldly in
 the history of the Lone Star State, and for more than a century, the
 life of famed rancher Charles Goodnight has inspired generations of
 Texans; and
 WHEREAS, Born on March 5, 1836, to Charles and Charlotte
 Goodnight in Macoupin County, Illinois, young Charles Goodnight
 joined his family in 1845 on the 800-mile journey to Milam County,
 Texas, where the boy arrived riding bareback on a white-faced mare
 named Blaze; from an early age, he learned the virtue of hard work,
 laboring as a farmhand, racing as a jockey, and hauling freight with
 teams of oxen; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Goodnight entered into a partnership with his
 stepbrother, John Wesley Sheek, in 1856 to raise 400 head of cattle
 in the Brazos Valley; in the late 1850s, he met Oliver Loving, and
 together the two young men drove a herd to the gold rush camps in
 Colorado before the Civil War; during the 1860s, he worked as a
 scout for the Texas Rangers, taking part in the Comanche wars and
 fighting outlaws along the Colorado and Brazos Rivers; and
 WHEREAS, After his service with the Rangers, Mr. Goodnight
 returned to the cattle business, and in 1866, he, Mr. Loving, and 18
 cowhands drove a herd from Fort Belknap, Texas, to Fort Sumner, New
 Mexico, and the route they forged became known as the
 Goodnight-Loving Trail, one of the most heavily trafficked cattle
 trails in the Southwest; Charles Goodnight is also credited with
 inventing the chuck wagon during that legendary drive; and
 WHEREAS, In 1870, he married Mary Ann "Molly" Dyer, a
 schoolteacher, and the couple settled in Colorado for several years
 before returning to Texas; in 1876, he entered into a partnership
 with John G. Adair to set up the JA Ranch along Palo Duro Canyon,
 with Mr. Goodnight serving as resident manager and part owner of
 the operation; over the next 11 years, he increased the ranch's herd
 and expanded its range and helped establish law and order in the
 Panhandle; he pioneered the use of many new techniques and
 inventions, including artificial watering facilities, barbed wire
 fences, and the development of Hereford bulls through
 crossbreeding; he also created one of the first western
 sidesaddles, for use by his wife; and
 WHEREAS, From 1887 to 1926, Charles and Molly Goodnight lived
 in a spacious, two-story ranch house on the Goodnight Ranch near the
 Salt Fork of the Red River; when his wife became distressed at the
 decline of the southern herd of native bison, Mr. Goodnight took up
 their cause, breeding them on his ranch and shipping buffalo to
 Yellowstone National Park and to zoos on the East Coast and in
 Europe; he also raised other animals and performed agricultural
 experiments with the encouragement of botanist Luther Burbank; and
 WHEREAS, Molly Goodnight died in 1926, and Charles Goodnight
 followed her three years later at the age of 93, and they are buried
 together in the Goodnight Cemetery, not far from the ranch they
 called home for nearly 40 years; the descendants of the Goodnights'
 buffalo live on as the Official State Bison Herd of Texas at Caprock
 Canyons State Park, and the legacy of Charles Goodnight, pioneer,
 cattleman, and naturalist, will endure as long as the Lone Star
 shines bright over Texas; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 83rd Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby designate March 5 as Charles Goodnight Day; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That in accordance with the provisions of Section
 391.004(d), Government Code, this designation remains in effect
 until the 10th anniversary of the date this resolution is passed.
 * * * * *