E | 03/13/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 753 | |
E | 03/12/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 717 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 693 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Printed in full | Journal Page: 398 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 394 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 394 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 662 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 662 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 02/21/2013 | Filed |