Senate | 04/04/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 690 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#138 | Journal Page: 1218 |
House | 04/03/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1218 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1212 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 02/21/2013 | Filed |