E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5443 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5391 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3519 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4535 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4555 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4161 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2566 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2255 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1270 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#303 | Journal Page: 1860 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1860 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1001 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Filed |