E | 04/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1914 | |
E | 04/12/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1562 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1531 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |