E | 04/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1531 | |
E | 04/08/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1472 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1455 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 679 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 547 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 714 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Filed |