E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3194 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Printed in full | Journal Page: 1503 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Again read | Journal Page: 1462 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1461 | |
E | 04/29/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2076 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1219 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1829 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 547 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 852 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 852 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 728 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Filed |