E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3194 | |
E | 04/29/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2076 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1219 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1830 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 785 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1440 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Filed |