E | 04/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1914 | |
E | 04/18/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1698 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 947 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1580 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 894 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 894 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 894 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 785 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1440 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Filed |