House | 04/29/2013 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2027 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1774 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 621 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 621 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Filed |