House | 04/23/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 245 | |
House | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 245 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |