Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR29 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R266 JAM-D
 By: Larson H.J.R. No. 29


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to limit the purposes for
 which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor
 fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the
 federal government may be used.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  (a)  Subject to legislative appropriation,
 allocation and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
 from motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing,
 maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and
 road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2,
 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment
 out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing
 law;] provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue
 from the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School
 Fund; and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by
 counties from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less
 than the maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and
 the percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws
 in effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
 purpose.
 (b)  For a biennium, the Legislature may not appropriate
 funds derived from the revenue described by Subsection (a) of this
 section or Section 7-b of this article for a purpose other than
 acquiring rights-of-way or constructing or maintaining public
 roadways in an amount that exceeds the lesser of:
 (1)  the total amount of those funds appropriated for a
 purpose other than acquiring rights-of-way or constructing or
 maintaining public roadways in the preceding biennium; or
 (2)  the amount determined under Subsection (c) of this
 section.
 (c)  For each biennium, the maximum amount that may be
 appropriated as provided by Subsection (b) of this section is
 reduced by 20 percent from the preceding biennium if the estimate of
 anticipated revenue from all sources made in advance of the regular
 session under Section 49a(a), Article III, of this constitution for
 the biennium exceeds the total amount of revenue from all sources
 for the preceding biennium by more than three times the amount of
 the reduction.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, to limit the purposes for which revenues
 from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and
 lubricants, and certain revenues received from the federal
 government may be used.
 (b)  The changes to Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this
 constitution made by the amendment apply only in connection with a
 state fiscal biennium that begins on or after September 1, 2015.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires September 2, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to limit the purposes
 for which revenues from motor vehicle registration fees, taxes on
 motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues received from the
 federal government may be used."