Senate | 04/15/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 909 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 909 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 785 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#188 | Journal Page: 1463 |
House | 04/09/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1202 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 01/30/2013 | Filed |