Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR79 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Branch, Turner of Collin H.J.R. No. 79
 (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to eliminate an obsolete
 requirement for a State Medical Education Board and a State Medical
 Education Fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 50a, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment eliminating an
 obsolete requirement for a State Medical Education Board and a
 State Medical Education Fund, neither of which is operational."
 * * * * *