Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1669 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1669 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1512 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2505 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | RV#576 | Journal Page: 2505 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2505 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2505 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/15/2013 | Filed |