E | 05/23/2013 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 4879 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2809 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4158 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4294 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4070 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2325 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1907 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1270 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Record vote | RV#355 | Journal Page: 1950 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Amended | 1-Fallon | Journal Page: 1950 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1562 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/15/2013 | Filed |