House | 04/03/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1120 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1120 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 958 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Filed |