Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HR1121

Caption

In memory of Chad Hutson Littlefield of Midlothian.

Impact

The resolution aims to extend condolences and recognition of Chad Littlefield's contributions to his community and family. It highlights the importance of memory and community support in the wake of loss. By recognizing individuals like Littlefield, the Texas Legislature underscores its commitment to fostering community values and solidarity. Such resolutions serve to remind citizens of the sacrifices made by individuals in their communities and the importance of remembering those who have passed.

Summary

HR1121 is a resolution presented by the Texas House of Representatives, paying tribute to the memory of Chad Hutson Littlefield from Midlothian, Texas. The resolution expresses profound sorrow over his death at the age of 35 and acknowledges the impact he had on his family, colleagues, and friends. Chad Littlefield, born on February 11, 1977, in Dallas, was known for his dedication to his family and his career at Eagle Labs, where he served as the facilities and logistics manager. This resolution honors his life and legacy as a devoted husband, father, and community member.

Sentiment

The sentiments surrounding HR1121 are overwhelmingly positive, reflecting a desire to honor and remember a valued member of the community. The resolution carries a tone of affection and respect towards Chad Littlefield, indicating the deep sorrow felt by those who knew him. This resolution serves to unite people in their grief while celebrating the life of Littlefield, showcasing the shared values of compassion and remembrance in Texas culture.

Contention

While HR1121 does not appear to face significant contention, such resolutions can sometimes elicit discussions about the legacy of the individual being memorialized and the impact they had on their community. The resolution, however, focuses correctly on highlighting the positive attributes of Chad Littlefield without delving into any divisive topics. It seeks to bring people together to reflect on his life rather than provoke debate.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX SR591

In memory of Chad Hutson Littlefield.

GA HR1567

Littlefield, Matthew Christopher "Matt"; condolences

TX HR385

Congratulating Bobby G. Littlefield Jr. on his retirement as Waco district engineer for the Texas Department of Transportation.

TX HR167

Recognizing February 12, 2019, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR225

Recognizing February 12, 2025, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR226

Recognizing February 15, 2023, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR283

Recognizing February 14, 2017, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR195

Recognizing February 14, 2017, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day.