House | 05/08/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2768 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1418 | |
House | 03/28/2013 | Filed |