House | 04/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1449 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Filed |