House | 03/14/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 724 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 724 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 380 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 266 | |
House | 01/22/2013 | Filed |