House | 05/04/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1975 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed |