House | 05/02/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2084 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2084 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1976 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Filed |