House | 05/10/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2736 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2736 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2361 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Filed |