House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3532 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3532 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3235 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Filed |