House | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4092 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4092 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3881 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Filed |