House | 03/08/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 551 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 551 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 272 | |
House | 01/28/2013 | Filed |