LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2013 - 83rd Regular
House
Bills
HR281
Action History
TX
Texas House Bill HR281
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular
Texas House Bill HR281
Action History
House
02/18/2013
Withdrawn from calendar
Journal Page: 384
House
02/14/2013
Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
House
02/12/2013
Considered in Rules and Resolutions
House
02/06/2013
Referred to Rules & Resolutions
Journal Page: 273
House
01/30/2013
Filed