Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HR328 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 328


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, For thousands of members of the American armed
 forces who have served in wartime, the heat of battle has been
 followed by the hardships and challenges of life as a prisoner of
 war; and
 WHEREAS, Harsh conditions and psychological duress have been
 the common lot of POWs, and often the degree of cruelty inflicted
 has reached the level of atrocity; the history of this country's
 military conflicts is replete with such infamous cases; among the
 horrors that attended the American Civil War were the Andersonville
 and Libby prison camps in the South and Elmira in the North, where,
 collectively, more than 16,000 prisoners died from a lack of food,
 inadequate medical care, wretched sanitation, and exposure to the
 elements; altogether, it is estimated that 56,000 men perished in
 Civil War prisons; and
 WHEREAS, In World War II, the notorious Bataan Death March
 followed on the heels of the surrender of 70,000 American and
 Filipino troops to the Japanese Army on April 9, 1942; treatment of
 those prisoners was so brutal that the Japanese officer initially
 in command was later tried as a war criminal and executed; still
 further misery awaited POWs in the Philippines; in late 1944, with
 U.S. forces poised to recapture the islands, the Japanese Army
 herded more than 126,000 Allied prisoners into the holds of
 merchant ships for the purpose of evacuation; many of those men died
 as a result of fetid, overcrowded conditions and a lack of food and
 water; in addition, over 21,000 Americans are believed to have been
 killed or injured when the "hell ships" carrying them were attacked
 by American planes and submarines; and
 WHEREAS, American prisoner-of-war deaths during the Korean
 War officially totaled more than 2,800, for a rate of over 40
 percent; before the creation of permanent prison camps, many of
 those captured died on death marches to temporary facilities;
 casualties were especially high in the first two years of the war,
 largely due to a lack of food, shelter, and medicine; prisoners also
 suffered physical abuse, and there were reported cases of torture;
 and
 WHEREAS, U.S. troops captured during the Vietnam War were
 kept in primitive conditions in South Vietnam, North Vietnam, Laos,
 and Cambodia; the so-called "Hanoi Hilton" prison in North Vietnam
 was the scene of repeated torture, while one out of every three
 Americans taken prisoner by the Viet Cong died from disease,
 injury, or execution; and
 WHEREAS, In today's military, women are increasingly
 assuming risks on a par with men; Army Specialist Shoshana Johnson,
 of El Paso, became one of the first two female POWs of Operation
 Iraqi Freedom on March 23, 2003, when her convoy was ambushed in
 Nasiriya; wounded in both ankles, she was held captive with other
 members of her group until they were rescued on April 13, 2003; and
 WHEREAS, Those prisoners of war who have survived their
 ordeal have continued to lead lives of service; among the most
 prominent is Congressman Sam Johnson, of Plano, who was shot down
 during his second tour of duty as a fighter pilot in the Vietnam War
 and who subsequently spent nearly seven years as a POW in North
 Vietnam; after retiring from a highly decorated 29-year career in
 the United States Air Force, Sam Johnson served in the Texas House
 of Representatives from 1985 to 1991, when he was elected to the
 U.S. Congress; and
 WHEREAS, During the Vietnam War, the plight of American
 military personnel who were listed either as having been captured
 or as missing in action gave rise to the creation of the POW/MIA
 flag; depicting the silhouette of a man flanked by a watchtower and
 a strand of barbed wire, the flag flies, at the direction of
 Congress, over the White House, the Capitol, and other specified
 sites on the occasion of six annual national observances, including
 Independence Day and Veterans Day; and
 WHEREAS, Our nation is fortunate to have sons and daughters
 whose love of country leads them to join one of the uniformed
 branches, yet we are aware that in answering their nation's call,
 they assume enormous burdens and risks; to those who have known the
 terrible rigors of prison camps while serving in this country's
 behalf, Americans owe a profound debt and eternal tribute; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 83rd Texas
 Legislature hereby commemorate April 9, 2013, as Former POW
 Recognition Day and honor all Texans who have experienced life as a
 prisoner of war for their immeasurable courage, commitment, and
 sacrifice.
 Price
 Branch
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 328 was adopted by the House on
 February 18, 2013, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House