House | 03/13/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 551 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 313 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Filed |