Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HR614

Caption

Recognizing February 27, 2013, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR694

Congratulating E. J. "Joe" King on his retirement as Brazoria County Judge.

TX HB2895

Relating to authorizing the sale of certain real property in Brazoria County by the Texas Board of Criminal Justice.

TX HR738

Recognizing March 7, 2017, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR695

Recognizing March 3, 2015, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR948

Recognizing March 19, 2013, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SB2028

Relating to the creation of additional judicial districts composed of Brazoria County.

TX HB3202

Relating to authorizing the transfer of certain real property held by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

TX HR172

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as Brazoria County Day at the State Capitol.