Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HR982

Caption

Recognizing April 9, 2013, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution is largely symbolic, intended to acknowledge the importance of REALTORS in the Texas real estate market and their advocacy for private property rights. By formalizing this recognition at the State Capitol, it reinforces the significance of the real estate profession and its impact on local economies and communities. This day serves as a reminder of the vital services provided by REALTORS to facilitate property transactions, development, and management, contributing to the vibrant real estate landscape in Texas.

Summary

House Resolution 982 recognizes April 9, 2013, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol in Texas. This resolution highlights the commitment of the State of Texas to the principles of private property rights, emphasizing the critical role REALTORS play in the real estate industry. It appreciates the contributions of the Texas Association of REALTORS, which has advocated for responsible government and upheld the values of competence, fairness, and integrity in their business practices. In recognizing this day, the resolution aims to honor the more than 80,000 members of the association for their service to the public and support of the state's economy.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding this resolution is overwhelmingly positive, celebrating the dedication of REALTORS and their influence on the state's real estate practices. Supporters highlight the professionalism and ethical standards upheld by members of the Texas Association of REALTORS, viewing their efforts as essential to maintaining a free enterprise system and ensuring property rights for all Texans. This celebration fosters goodwill within the community and strengthens the relationship between the legislature and real estate professionals.

Contention

Although the resolution does not encompass any controversial elements, it reflects ongoing dialogues about property rights and the roles of various stakeholders in the real estate market. The recognition of REALTOR Appreciation Day may invite discussions on related policy issues, such as housing affordability, land use regulations, and local property markets. However, the overwhelming focus remains on honoring the contributions and professionalism of REALTORS rather than addressing contentious legislation.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HR1115

Recognizing March 31, 2009, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR1131

Recognizing April 12, 2011, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR1696

Recognizing April 14, 2015, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR1044

Recognizing April 4, 2017, as REALTOR Appreciation Day at the State Capitol.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.