House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 955 | |
House | 03/15/2013 | Filed |