House | 02/14/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 333 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 333 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 248 | |
House | 01/10/2013 | Filed |