E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5290
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1360
|
Journal Page: 5289
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5289
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2981
|
Journal Page: 5288
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1075
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2167
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3757
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#958
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Nevrez
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1655
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|