Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1017 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1017


 AN ACT
 relating to the funding for and administration of travel and
 information operations by the Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 204.003, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 204.003.  TRAVEL INFORMATION CENTERS. (a)  The
 department shall maintain and operate travel information centers
 [at the principal gateways to this state] to provide highway
 information, travel guidance, and descriptive material designed to
 assist the traveling public and stimulate travel to and within this
 state.
 (b)  The department may:
 (1)  enter into an agreement with:
 (A)  another state agency for the operation of a
 travel information center; or
 (B)  a local government, including a commission
 created under Chapter 391, Local Government Code, for the operation
 of a travel information center that is located within the
 boundaries of the local government; and
 (2)  issue a request for proposals to private or
 nonprofit entities for the operation of a travel information
 center.
 (c)  The department may sell commercial advertising space at
 a travel information center if the advertising is not visible from
 the main traveled way of the highway. If the department sells
 commercial advertising space, the department shall set rates for
 the advertising and other services available at a travel
 information center at a level that generates receipts approximately
 sufficient to cover the cost of its travel and information
 operations.
 (d)  The department may not engage in an activity authorized
 under Subsection (c) or another provision of this chapter that
 would decrease the amount of federal highway funding available to
 the department.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 204.009, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 204.009.  SALE OF PROMOTIONAL ITEMS, ADVERTISING, AND
 ACKNOWLEDGMENTS.
 SECTION 3.  Section 204.009, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (b) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  The department may enter into an agreement for the
 acknowledgment of donations if the acknowledgment does not contain
 comparative or qualitative descriptions of the donor's products,
 services, facilities, or companies.
 (b)  All proceeds from the sale of the items and advertising
 under this chapter and all donations acknowledged under this
 section shall be deposited to the credit of a separate account in
 the state highway fund. Money in the account is dedicated for the
 department's use in its travel and information operations.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1017 passed the Senate on
 April 18, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2013, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2013, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2013, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1017 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 23, 2013, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2013, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor