Senate | 05/07/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 112 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 112 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |