E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3515 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3068 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2808 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1075 | Journal Page: 4189 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4189 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4189 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4031 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4031 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3242 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1203 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1152 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ellis | Journal Page: 1151 |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1151 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1148 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1147 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 425 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 425 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |