House | 05/13/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3193 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1220 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1219 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 425 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 425 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |