Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1008
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
4-Sanford
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Motion to table fails
|
3-Hughes, et al.
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Hughes, S. Turner, Frank, Dutton, P. King, Smithee, and D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3842
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Hughes, S. Turner, Smithee, Dutton, D. Bonnen, Frank, and P. King
|
Journal Page: 3832
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3832
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2074
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1332
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Carona
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1289
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1287
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1287
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 426
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 426
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|