Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1076 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hegar S.B. No. 1076
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 4, 2013,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0;
 April 4, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the circumstances under which an appraisal review board
 hearing shall be closed to the public.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.66, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (d-1) and (d-2) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (d-1), hearings
 [Hearings] conducted as provided by this chapter are open to the
 public.
 (d-1)  Notwithstanding Chapter 551, Government Code, the
 appraisal review board shall conduct a hearing that is closed to the
 public if the property owner or the chief appraiser intends to
 disclose proprietary or confidential information at the hearing
 that will assist the review board in determining the protest.  The
 review board may hold a closed hearing under this subsection only on
 a joint motion by the property owner and the chief appraiser.
 (d-2)  Information described by Subsection (d-1) is
 considered information obtained under Section 22.27.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *