Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1099 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1099
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain designations by a physical
 therapist.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (d), Section 453.201, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Unless the person is a physical therapist, a person,
 including the person's employee or other agent or representative,
 may not use in connection with the person's name or business
 activity:
 (1)  the words "physical therapy," "physical
 therapist," "physiotherapy," "physiotherapist," "licensed
 physical therapist," "registered physical therapist," or "physical
 therapist assistant";
 (2)  the letters "PT," "PhT," "LPT," "RPT," "DPT,"
 "MPT," or "PTA"; or
 (3)  any other words, letters, abbreviations, or
 insignia indicating or implying, by any means or in any way, that
 physical therapy is provided or supplied.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *