House | 05/21/2013 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 3 | Journal Page: 4060 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 4060 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Amended | 4-Lozano | Journal Page: 4059 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Amendment tabled | 2-Dukes | Journal Page: 4059 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4056 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Dukes | Journal Page: 4056 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4054 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1510 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 778 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 89 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 89 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |