House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2273
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2273
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1324
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 113
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 113
|
Senate
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2012
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|