E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/08/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1522
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1272
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#306
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1816
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1816
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1816
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1716
|
Journal Page: 1816
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 666
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 608
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 432
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 432
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|