Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1130 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1130
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2013; March 12, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 11, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 11, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1130 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the temporary licensing of a dentist who performs
 voluntary charity care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 256, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 256.1016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 256.1016.  TEMPORARY LICENSE FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
 (a)  In this section, "voluntary charity care" has the meaning
 assigned by board rule under Section 256.102.
 (b)  The board shall grant a temporary license for a dentist
 whose practice consists only of voluntary charity care to a
 reputable dentist who meets the requirements of Sections
 256.101(a)(3), (4), and (5) and who:
 (1)  ceased practicing dentistry in this state, or in
 another state that the board has determined has licensing
 requirements that are substantially similar to the requirements of
 this state, not more than two years before the date the dentist
 applies for a license under this section and was licensed in good
 standing at the time the dentist ceased practicing dentistry; or
 (2)  is currently licensed in another state that the
 board has determined has licensing requirements that are
 substantially similar to the requirements of this state.
 (c)  A dentist issued a license under this section shall:
 (1)  confine the dentist's practice to voluntary
 charity care;
 (2)  practice only in a geographic area specified by
 the license; and
 (3)  practice only for the period specified by the
 license.
 (d)  The board shall adopt rules as necessary to implement
 this section.
 (e)  The board shall take disciplinary action against a
 dentist licensed under this section for a violation of this
 subtitle or board rules in the same manner as against a dentist
 licensed under Subchapter A.
 SECTION 2.  The State Board of Dental Examiners shall adopt
 rules as necessary to implement Section 256.1016, Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *