E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3853
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4873
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3937
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1017
|
Journal Page: 3937
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3937
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 3937
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3936
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 3851
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3851
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3096
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|