1 | 1 | | By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1157 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Otto) |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the transfer of certain state property in Walker County |
---|
8 | 8 | | from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to the board of regents of |
---|
9 | 9 | | the Texas State University System. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. (a) Not later than January 1, 2014, the Texas |
---|
12 | 12 | | Board of Criminal Justice shall donate and transfer the real |
---|
13 | 13 | | property described by Subsection (e) of this section to the board of |
---|
14 | 14 | | regents of the Texas State University System for use by Sam Houston |
---|
15 | 15 | | State University. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall convey the |
---|
17 | 17 | | property by a deed without warranty regarding covenants of title. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (c) The deed must include a provision that: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) requires Sam Houston State University to use the |
---|
20 | 20 | | property primarily for a purpose that benefits the public interest |
---|
21 | 21 | | of the state; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) indicates that ownership of the property will |
---|
23 | 23 | | automatically revert to the Texas Board of Criminal Justice if Sam |
---|
24 | 24 | | Houston State University fails to use the property primarily for a |
---|
25 | 25 | | purpose that benefits the public interest of the state. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (d) The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall retain custody |
---|
27 | 27 | | of the deed after the deed is filed in the real property records of |
---|
28 | 28 | | Walker County. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (e) The real property referred to in this section is |
---|
30 | 30 | | described as follows: |
---|
31 | 31 | | Being 78.823 acres of land, more or less, situated in the City |
---|
32 | 32 | | of Huntsville, P. GRAY SURVEY, Abstract No. 24, Walker County, |
---|
33 | 33 | | Texas and being out of and a part of a called 515 acre tract as |
---|
34 | 34 | | described in a Deed from Ed H. Cunningham, et al to the State of |
---|
35 | 35 | | Texas, dated July 10, 1883 and recorded in Volume Y, Page 181, Deed |
---|
36 | 36 | | Records, said 78.823 acre tract being more definitely described as |
---|
37 | 37 | | follows: |
---|
38 | 38 | | BEGINNING at the northeast corner of a called 5.00 acre |
---|
39 | 39 | | tract, out of said 515 acre tract, as described in a Deed from the |
---|
40 | 40 | | Texas Board of Criminal Justice, on behalf of the Texas Department |
---|
41 | 41 | | of Criminal Justice, to the County of Walker (Veteran's Complex), |
---|
42 | 42 | | dated October 29, 2003 and recorded in Volume 595, Page 210, |
---|
43 | 43 | | Official Records, found a 5/8" iron rod with a plastic cap in the |
---|
44 | 44 | | south right-of-way of State Highway 75, being a 50 foot strip |
---|
45 | 45 | | (called 3.78 acres) conveyed to the State of Texas in Volume 209, |
---|
46 | 46 | | Page 707, Deed Records, said iron rod having coordinates of |
---|
47 | 47 | | N:10263383.58, E:3788833.74 and being the most northerly northwest |
---|
48 | 48 | | corner of the herein described tract; |
---|
49 | 49 | | THENCE S83°08'57"E, with the south right-of-way of said S.H. |
---|
50 | 50 | | 75, for a distance of 1245.10 feet to a called angle point of said |
---|
51 | 51 | | 3.78 acre tract (TxDOT Station 79+76.59), set a 5/8" iron rod, with |
---|
52 | 52 | | a plastic cap; |
---|
53 | 53 | | THENCE N70°17'06"E, continuing with the south right-of-way of |
---|
54 | 54 | | said S.H. 75, for a distance of 95.23 feet to its intersection with |
---|
55 | 55 | | the east line of said 515 acre tract, same being the apparent |
---|
56 | 56 | | northwest corner of a called 5.51 acre tract as described in a Deed |
---|
57 | 57 | | from E. A. Heaton to Carol Joe Heaton, dated February 19, 1966 and |
---|
58 | 58 | | recorded in Volume 198, Page 501, Deed Records, set a 5/8" iron rod |
---|
59 | 59 | | with a plastic cap for the northeast corner of the herein described |
---|
60 | 60 | | tract, from which a 5" square concrete monument, found for the |
---|
61 | 61 | | northeast corner of said 515 acre tract, bears NO2°32'37"W- 551.88 |
---|
62 | 62 | | feet; |
---|
63 | 63 | | THENCE S02°32'37"E, with the east line of said 515 acre tract |
---|
64 | 64 | | and the called west line of said Heaton tract, at 660.0 pass the |
---|
65 | 65 | | apparent southwest corner of said Heaton tract, continuing for a |
---|
66 | 66 | | total distance of 2649.68 feet to its intersection with the |
---|
67 | 67 | | northeast right-of-way of Interstate Highway No. 45, as described |
---|
68 | 68 | | in "Tract No. 1 (called 55.13 acres)" in a Right of Way Deed from the |
---|
69 | 69 | | Texas Prison Board to the Texas State Highway Commission, dated |
---|
70 | 70 | | July 19, 1957 and recorded in Volume 158, Page 177, Deed Records, |
---|
71 | 71 | | set a 5/8" iron rod with a plastic cap at a fence corner post for the |
---|
72 | 72 | | southeast corner of the herein described tract, from said iron rod a |
---|
73 | 73 | | 5" square concrete monument, found for the southeast corner of said |
---|
74 | 74 | | 515 acre tract, bears S02°32'37"E- 2574.60 feet; |
---|
75 | 75 | | THENCE, with the northeast lines of said I.H. 45, as |
---|
76 | 76 | | presently monumented, the following calls: |
---|
77 | 77 | | 1). N47°43'50"W- 1972.52 feet to a found TxDOT concrete |
---|
78 | 78 | | monument; |
---|
79 | 79 | | 2). N49°39'48"W- 259.16 feet to a found TxDOT concrete |
---|
80 | 80 | | monument; |
---|
81 | 81 | | 3). N51°28'15"W- 258.69 feet to a found TxDOT concrete |
---|
82 | 82 | | monument; |
---|
83 | 83 | | 4). N53°43'57"W- 250.31 feet to a found TxDOT concrete |
---|
84 | 84 | | monument; |
---|
85 | 85 | | and 5). N55°10'12"W, at 356.2 feet pass a point in a creek for |
---|
86 | 86 | | the south corner of a right-of-way easement (called 2.744 acres) |
---|
87 | 87 | | from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to the Texas |
---|
88 | 88 | | Transportation Commission, dated January 6, 2000 and recorded in |
---|
89 | 89 | | Volume 412, Page 149, Official Records, continuing for a total |
---|
90 | 90 | | distance of 404.59 feet to a 5/8" iron rod, with a plastic cap, set |
---|
91 | 91 | | for the southwest corner of the herein described tract; |
---|
92 | 92 | | THENCE N29°54'57"E, crossing said right-of-way easement, at |
---|
93 | 93 | | 28.58 feet pass a northeasterly line of said easement, same being |
---|
94 | 94 | | the south corner of a called 10.01 acre tract, out of said 515 acre |
---|
95 | 95 | | tract, as described in a Deed from the County of Walker to the Texas |
---|
96 | 96 | | Prison Museum, dated July 16, 2001 and recorded in Volume 466, Page |
---|
97 | 97 | | 755, Official Records, continuing with the southeast line of said |
---|
98 | 98 | | 10.01 acre tract, at 171.32 feet pass a point for the west corner of |
---|
99 | 99 | | a sanitary sewer, drainage and road easement (called 0.455 acre) as |
---|
100 | 100 | | described in a Deed from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to the |
---|
101 | 101 | | County of Walker, dated May 7, 2004 and recorded in Volume 634, Page |
---|
102 | 102 | | 550, Official Records, continuing with the common line of said |
---|
103 | 103 | | 10.01 acre and 0.455 acre tracts, for a total distance of 501.32 |
---|
104 | 104 | | feet to the southwest corner of said County of Walker 5.00 acre |
---|
105 | 105 | | tract (Veteran's Complex), same being the northwest corner of said |
---|
106 | 106 | | 0.455 acre tract, found a 5/8" iron rod with a plastic cap; |
---|
107 | 107 | | THENCE S83°08'48"E, with the south line of said 5.00 acre |
---|
108 | 108 | | tract (Veteran's Complex), for a distance of 659.91 feet to its |
---|
109 | 109 | | southeast corner, set a 5/8" iron rod at a fence corner post; |
---|
110 | 110 | | THENCE N06°51'03"E, with the east line of said 5.00 acre |
---|
111 | 111 | | tract, for a distance of 375.56 feet to the PLACE OF BEGINNING. |
---|
112 | 112 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
113 | 113 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
114 | 114 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
115 | 115 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
116 | 116 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|