E
|
06/14/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1370
|
Journal Page: 5366
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5366
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3056
|
Journal Page: 5364
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5390
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3807
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1079
|
Journal Page: 3807
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3707
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4875
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2919
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1057
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Menndez
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1198
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1116
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 779
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 436
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|